MA S2097 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote bicycle safety. Transportation.
Title
Promoting bicycle safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied S2042 |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2058 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2091 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1651 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2042 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2204
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
S2058 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2091 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1651 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2042 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2204
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2097.pdf |