MA S2097 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2531
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote resilience against the heat-related impacts of climate change. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Promoting resilience against the heat-related impacts of climate change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Accompanied S2531 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2094 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H2942 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2944 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2943 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
H4442 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2531 (Replaced by) 2024-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2829
H2942 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2944 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2943 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
H4442 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2531 (Replaced by) 2024-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2829
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2097.pdf |