MA S2098 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Christine McDonnell an employee of the Department of Corrections. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Christine McDonnell an employee of the department of corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-12-27 | House | House concurred |
2011-12-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2098 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17730&generalCourtId=1 |