MA S2110 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Text of the Senate Bill to prohibit the use of mobile telephones while operating a motor vehicle (Senate, No. 2110) (being the text of Senate, No. 2093, printed as amended)
Title
To prohibit the use of mobile telephones while operating a motor vehicle
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Text of S2093, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3169 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1760 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3138 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
H3036 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3128 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1760 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3138 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
H3036 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3128 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2110.pdf |