MA S2116 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a clean transportation future. Transportation.
Title
Relative to a clean transportation future
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2559 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2559 |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1927 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1923
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1376 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2057 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2198
S2198 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S2216 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2245
S2245 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1376 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2057 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2198
S2198 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S2216 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2245
S2245 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2116.pdf |