MA S2124 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2310
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-14)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to reduction of property tax liability for veterans. Revenue.
Title
To reduce the property tax liability in exchange for volunteer service for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2310 |
2012-03-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2012 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2012-02-02 | House | House concurred |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint committee on Revenue |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 & Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S2310 (Replaced by) 2012-07-24 - Reported (in part) by S1497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2124 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17747&generalCourtId=1 |