MA S2125 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to the create the Massachusetts Board of Public Safety Building Authority. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the creation of the Massachusetts Board of Public Safety Building Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2971 |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-20 | House | House concurred |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3821 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1542 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S851 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H548 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H3821 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1542 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S851 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H548 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2125 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2125.pdf |