MA S2135 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-05 - Rules suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-05 - Rules suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the financial condition of the town of Templeton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the financial condition of the town of Templeton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-08-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-14 | House | House concurred |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2135 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2135.pdf |