MA S2149 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase membership on the Massport Community Advisory Committee. Transportation.
Title
Relative to increasing membership on the Massport Community Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2558 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2558 |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2937 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1528 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1528 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2149.pdf |