MA S2186 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S989
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to defense against abusive waivers
Title
Relative to defense against abusive waivers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-23 | Senate | New draft of S989 |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S989 (Replaces) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
H784 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
H1013 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3962
H784 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
H1013 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3962
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2186.pdf |