MA S2191 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S183
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-19 - Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-19 - Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act regulating secondary metals dealing
Title
An Act regulating secondary metals dealing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-19 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-11-18 | Passed to be engrossed - 37 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 166) | |
2009-11-18 | Read third | |
2009-11-18 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-18 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-18 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment | |
2009-11-05 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-11-05 | New draft of S183 | |
2009-11-05 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S183 (Replaces) 2010-04-05 - Reporting date extended to Thursday, April 30, 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02191.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02191.htm |