MA S2191 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill establishing the MassMade Program (Senate, No. 2135),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2191).
Title
Establishing the MassMade Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #267 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read third |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2135 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #266 [YEAS 34 - NAYS 2] |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Moore) adopted - Roll Call #265 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 31, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2135 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
S2065 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2320 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4637
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
S2065 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2320 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4637
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2191 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2191.pdf |