MA S2244 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts Public Arts Program. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts Public Arts Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied by H3380 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2052 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S575 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2083 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2703
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S254 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H3380 (Replaces) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied S2244
H2052 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S575 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2083 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2703
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S254 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H3380 (Replaces) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied S2244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2244.pdf |