MA S2245 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2206
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - Reprinted as amended, see S02260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - Reprinted as amended, see S02260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act relative to comprehensive siting reform for land based wind projects
Title
An Act relative to comprehensive siting reform for land based wind projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | Reprinted as amended, see S02260 | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to be engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#7) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#16) rejected | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#15) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#14) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#13) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#9) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#10) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#8) rejected | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#6) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#5) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#4) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#3) adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#2) rejected | |
2010-02-04 | Amendment (#1) rejected | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to lay on the table negatived | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to lay on the table negatived | |
2010-01-21 | Postponed to Thursday, January 28, 2010 | |
2010-01-14 | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session | |
2010-01-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-13 | Substituted for S2206 | |
2010-01-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-13 | New draft of S2206 | |
2010-01-13 | Reported from the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2206 (Replaces) 2010-01-13 - New draft substituted, see S2245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02245.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02245.htm |