MA S2245 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S134
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to motor vehicle warranties,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2245).
Title
Relative to motor vehicle warranties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New draft of S134 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S134 (Replaces) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2245
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1812 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1852 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S402 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1812 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1852 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S402 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2245 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2245.pdf |