MA S2246 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2009
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Essex to sell or lease certain real property at Conomo Point
Title
Authorizing the town of Essex to sell or lease certain real property at Conomo Point
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Enacted (see Roll Call # 189 - Yeas 34 - Nays 0) |
2012-05-16 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 249) |
2012-05-16 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | New draft of S2009 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2009 (Replaces) 2012-05-03 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2246
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2246 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117675&generalCourtId=1 |