MA S2268 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to compliance with the fair minimum wage. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to compliance with the fair minimum wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H27 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4329
H1002 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1015 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1004 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H2700 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H27 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4329
H1002 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1015 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1004 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H2700 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2268 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2268.pdf |