MA S2274 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S667
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure students' access to academic transcripts,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2274).
Title
Ensuring students' access to academic transcripts
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-02-01 | Senate | New draft of S667 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S667 (Replaces) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2274 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2274.pdf |