MA S2285 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Springfield to exchange parcels of land. . Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Springfield to exchange parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2330 |
2012-06-07 | House | House concurred |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2330 (Replaced by) 2012-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2285 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118776&generalCourtId=1 |