MA S2291 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the conveyance of certain state land in the town of Adams. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the change of use of a certain parcel of land in the town of Adams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #466 [Yeas 39 - Nays 0] |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted 149 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 479) |
2014-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-23 | House | House concurred |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2291 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2291.pdf |