MA S2291 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to public health.
Title
Public health
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4187 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3827 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4480 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4731 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4991 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 426 of the Acts of 2018
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3827 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4480 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4731 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4991 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 426 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2291 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2291.pdf |