MA S2302 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to a vote in the Berkshire Hills Regional School District. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to a vote in the Berkshire Hills Regional School District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-18 | House | Enacted |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-08-14 | House | Amendment adopted |
2014-08-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-08-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-08-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-08-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-23 | House | House concurred |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Election Laws |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2302 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2302.pdf |