MA S2331 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting puppies and kittens (Senate, No. 1155),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2331).
Title
Relative to protecting puppies and kittens
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #333 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-19 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #333 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read third |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S1155 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (O'Connor) adopted -see Roll Call #332 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1155 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1155 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2331
S470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489