MA S235 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act to further narrow the achievement gap By Mr. Finegold, a petition of Barry R. Finegold, Frank A. Moran, Christopher G. Fallon, George N. Peterson, Jr. and other members of the General Court to further narrow the achievement gap. Education.
Title
To further narrow the achievement gap
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Christopher Fallon [D] | Rep. George Peterson [R] |
Sen. Anthony Petruccelli [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 25, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 (10:00-1:00); Room 222 (1:00-3:00) |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S235 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S235.pdf |