MA S236 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2701
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a dental patient bill of rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Establishing a dental patient bill of rights
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
Sen. John Cronin [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2701 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | House | House concurred |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S714 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H1173 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
S2701 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S714 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H1173 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
S2701 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S236.pdf |