MA S2382 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize the MBTA Pension system. Transportation.
Title
Relative to modernizing the MBTA pension system
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2621 |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2621 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2686 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2621 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2686 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2382 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2382.pdf |