MA S2399 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S263
Note: Legislation replaced by S2459
Note: Legislation replaced by S2459
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to student sex education,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2399).
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2459 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2459 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-14 | Senate | New draft of S263 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S263 (Replaces) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2399
H438 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S309 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S327 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2459 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - Reprinted as amended, see S2475
H438 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S309 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S327 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2459 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - Reprinted as amended, see S2475
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2399.pdf |