MA S2399 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2680
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to define "Gold Star families". Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Defining "Gold Star families"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2680 |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2680 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3668 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2434 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3668 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2434 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2399.pdf |