MA S2434 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase annuity for disabled Veterans and Gold Star families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Increasing annuity for disabled Veterans and Gold Star families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday April 8, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 8, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2399 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3668 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1934 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H1207 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2399 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3668 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1934 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H1207 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2434 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2434.pdf |