MA S2424 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Scituate to appoint retired police officers as special police officers
Title
Authorizing the town of Scituate to appoint retired police officers as special police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-09-14 | House | Enacted |
2023-09-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-08-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-08-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-08-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-07-17 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-13 | Senate | New draft (O'Connor) of S1710 |
Same As/Similar To
S1710 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2424
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2424.pdf |