MA S1710 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of retired police officers in the town of Scituate. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Scituate to appoint retired police officers as special police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Senate | New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2424 |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Accompanied by H2565 |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2565 (Similar To) 2023-05-22 - Accompanied S1710
S2424 (Replaced by) 2023-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
S2424 (Replaced by) 2023-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1710 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1710.pdf |