MA S2472 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey an easement in certain land in the city of Fall River. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey an easement in certain land in the city of Fall River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2780 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read second |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2780 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-01-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2780 (Replaced by) 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2472 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2472.pdf |