MA S2484 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Donna Paul, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Donna Paul, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-10-20 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-10-20 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-10-17 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-10-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-10-03 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-08-25 | House | House concurred |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S18 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2015
S19 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2494 (Similar To) 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2016
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S18 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2015
S19 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2494 (Similar To) 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2016
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2484.pdf |