MA S2494 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Aaron Paul, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Aaron Paul, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-11-07 | House | Enacted |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-11-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-10-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-10-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-10-24 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-09-26 | House | House concurred |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S18 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2015
S19 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2484 (Similar To) 2016-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S37 (Similar To) 2015-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S1917
S18 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2015
S19 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2484 (Similar To) 2016-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S37 (Similar To) 2015-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S1917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2494 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2494.pdf |