MA S256 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4141
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to circuit breaker reimbursement. Education.
Title
Relative to circuit breaker reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4141 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4141 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S216 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
H354 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
S1457 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1320 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1483 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1464 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3770
S216 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
H354 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
S1457 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1320 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1483 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1464 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S256 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S256.pdf |