MA S2574 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent wage theft and promote employer accountability
Title
To prevent wage theft and promote employer accountability
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -- see Roll Call #428 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Text of S2546, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1378 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H2445 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S999 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1378 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H2445 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S999 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2574 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2574.pdf |