MA S26 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the police department in the town of Burlington from the civil service law.
Title
Exempting the police department in the town of Burlington from the civil service law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules (under Senate Rule 19) |
Same As/Similar To
S27 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
S2368 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2016
S2476 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4172 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2302 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Senate concurred
S2368 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2016
S2476 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4172 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2302 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S26 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S26.pdf |