MA S261 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2330
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve literacy skills. Education.
Title
To improve literacy skills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2330 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2330 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S129 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S271 (Similar To) 2015-09-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S492 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S129 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S271 (Similar To) 2015-09-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S492 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S261 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S261.pdf |