MA S2617 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2394
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, July 19, 2018 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters (Senate, No. 2394),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2616).
Title
Promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2394 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2394 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2394 (Replaces) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2617
H2138 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2942 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4042
H2138 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2942 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2617 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2617.pdf |