MA S2624 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, July 24, 2018 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill protecting research animals (Senate, No. 2387),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2624).
Title
Protecting research animals
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #482 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #482 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2387 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2387 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1127 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
S451 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2460
S541 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2028 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1308 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S451 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2460
S541 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2028 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1308 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2624 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2624.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall482.pdf |