MA S2657 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2628
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - Order reported favorably committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - Order reported favorably committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to hardship licenses for first time offenders, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2657).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on the Judiciary to make an investigation and study of a certain current Senate document relative to hardship licenses for first time offenders
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | Order reported favorably committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Accompanied by S2628 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2628 (Replaces) 2018-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2657
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2657.pdf |