MA S2657 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S102
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote financial stability and asset development, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2657).
Title
Removing barriers to lifting people out of poverty
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Danillo Sena [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-07 | Senate | New draft of S102 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Replaces) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2657
S121 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S898 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S852 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1227 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
S121 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S898 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S852 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1227 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2657.pdf |