MA S266 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Accompanied H1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Accompanied H1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to correct income calculation for spouses of nursing home residents
Title
To correct income calculation for spouses of nursing home residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | House | Accompanied H1966 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1966 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S266 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9334&generalCourtId=1 |