MA S2671 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 418 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 418 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the appointment of special police officers in the city of New Bedford. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the city of New Bedford
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Christopher Markey [D] |
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 418 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-27 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-20 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2018-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2018 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-11-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H749 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H749 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2671 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2671.pdf |