MA S2690 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, December 20, 2018 -- The committee on Rules to whom was referred the Senate Bill to prevent death and disability from stroke (Senate, No. 1237),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2690).
Title
To prevent death and disability from stroke
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-27 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1237 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1237 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1237 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - New draft substituted, see S2690
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H475 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H165 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H475 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H165 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2690 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2690.pdf |