MA S2706 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Board of Selectmen in the town of Cohasset to the Select Board and making certain other related gender-neutral changes
Title
Renaming the Board of Selectmen in the town of Cohasset to the Select Board and making certain other related gender-neutral changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-04-25 | House | Enacted |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-02-22 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2474 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Recommended new draft (O'Connor) for S2474 |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2706 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2706.pdf |