MA S2750 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S305
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote racially integrated schools, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2750).
Title
Establishing a study of school segregation
Sponsors
House Committee on Education | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-03-10 | Senate | New draft of S305 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S305 (Replaces) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2750
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H4544 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H4544 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2750 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2750.pdf |