MA S276 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include recycling education in the Massachusetts Science and Technology/Engineering Curriculum Framework. Education.
Title
Including recycling education in the Massachusetts Science and Technology/Engineering Curriculum Framework
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2338 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2338 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S661 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2184
S662 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S230 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S661 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2184
S662 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S230 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S276.pdf |