MA S2338 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation relative to media literacy in schools, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2338).
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied by S276, S291, S329, S341, S345 and S349 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S276 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S291 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S329 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S341 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S345 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S349 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S2337 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2341 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2342 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2343 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4290 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H4414 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H4272 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S291 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S329 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S341 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S345 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S349 (Replaces) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S2337 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2341 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2342 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2343 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4290 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H4414 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H4272 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2338 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2338.pdf |