MA S2819 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Tewksbury to convert a certain parcel of land to general recreational purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Tewksbury to convert a certain parcel of land to general recreational purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2024-06-17 | House | House concurred |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2784 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2692 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2581 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2692 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2581 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2819 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2819.pdf |